House | 04/28/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1956 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1697 | Journal Page: 1955 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 12/16/2024 | Filed |