Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB165 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 89R2078 RDS-D
22 By: Vasut H.B. No. 165
33
44
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to the elimination of ad valorem taxes and the creation of
1010 a joint interim committee on the elimination of those taxes.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "committee" means the joint
1313 interim committee on the elimination of ad valorem taxes.
1414 (b) The joint interim committee on the elimination of ad
1515 valorem taxes is composed of:
1616 (1) five members of the house of representatives
1717 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
1818 (2) five senators appointed by the lieutenant
1919 governor.
2020 (c) The speaker of the house of representatives and the
2121 lieutenant governor shall make the appointments under Subsection
2222 (b) of this section not later than November 1, 2025.
2323 (d) The speaker of the house of representatives and the
2424 lieutenant governor shall each designate a co-chair from among the
2525 committee members.
2626 (e) The committee shall convene at the joint call of the
2727 co-chairs.
2828 (f) The committee has all other powers and duties provided
2929 to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and
3030 house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government
3131 Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on
3232 administration.
3333 (g) The committee shall conduct a comprehensive study of
3434 alternative methods of taxation to replace local tax revenue that
3535 will be lost when ad valorem taxes are eliminated.
3636 (h) For each alternative method of taxation considered by
3737 the committee, the committee shall:
3838 (1) consider whether political subdivisions that
3939 currently impose ad valorem taxes would have the authority to
4040 impose the proposed alternative tax;
4141 (2) determine the average tax rate for the proposed
4242 alternative tax imposed by each type of political subdivision that
4343 would be necessary to generate the same amount of tax revenue as the
4444 amount of tax revenue lost as a result of the elimination of ad
4545 valorem taxes;
4646 (3) determine, if appropriate, the effect that
4747 broadening the application of the proposed alternative tax at the
4848 local level would have on the tax rates identified under
4949 Subdivision (2) of this subsection;
5050 (4) identify whether tax revenue generated by the
5151 proposed alternative tax would require redistribution to offset
5252 disparities in available local tax revenue as a result of the
5353 elimination of ad valorem taxes and, if so, evaluate the different
5454 mechanisms of redistribution available; and
5555 (5) identify and examine any other issue that would
5656 need to be addressed to implement the elimination of ad valorem
5757 taxes.
5858 (i) On request of the committee, a state agency or political
5959 subdivision shall provide information for and assistance in
6060 conducting the study under this section.
6161 (j) Not later than November 1, 2026, the committee shall
6262 prepare and submit to the legislature a written report containing
6363 the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
6464 other action.
6565 (k) The committee is abolished and this section expires
6666 January 1, 2027.
6767 SECTION 2. (a) Title 1, Tax Code, is repealed.
6868 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, this state or a political
6969 subdivision of this state may not impose an ad valorem tax. To the
7070 extent of a conflict, this section controls over a conflicting
7171 provision in a general or special law.
7272 (c) The change in law made by this section does not affect
7373 tax liability accruing before the effective date of this section.
7474 That liability continues in effect as if this section had not been
7575 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
7676 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
7777 the liability for those taxes.
7878 (d) This section takes effect January 1, 2035.
7979 SECTION 3. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
8080 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.