House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 12/18/2024 | Filed |