Senate | 05/08/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | RV#1786 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 3316 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3316 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1673 | Journal Page: 3190 |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Amended | 1-Bucy | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3189 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 12/18/2024 | Filed |