Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1663
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1028
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2348
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#884
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#884
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Campos
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended 1-Campos
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1381
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably with amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
12/19/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|