Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1688 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Louderback H.B. No. 1688
22
33
44
55
66 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
77 AN ACT
88 relating to a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of all
99 or part of the appraised value of the residence homesteads of
1010 certain peace officers.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 11.13(i), Tax Code, is amended to read as
1313 follows:
1414 (i) The assessor and collector for a taxing unit may
1515 disregard the exemptions authorized by Subsection (b), (c), (d),
1616 [or] (n), or (s) [of this section] and assess and collect a tax
1717 pledged for payment of debt without deducting the amount of the
1818 exemption if:
1919 (1) prior to adoption of the exemption, the taxing
2020 unit pledged the taxes for the payment of a debt; and
2121 (2) granting the exemption would impair the obligation
2222 of the contract creating the debt.
2323 SECTION 2. Section 11.13(m), Tax Code, is amended by adding
2424 Subdivision (1-a) to read as follows:
2525 (1-a) "Eligible peace officer" means an individual
2626 listed under Article 2.12(1), (2), (3), or (4), Code of Criminal
2727 Procedure, who is employed full-time as a peace officer by this
2828 state or by a political subdivision of this state.
2929 SECTION 3. Section 11.13, Tax Code, is amended by adding
3030 Subsections (s) and (t) to read as follows:
3131 (s) In addition to any other exemptions provided by this
3232 section, an eligible peace officer is entitled to an exemption from
3333 taxation by a taxing unit of all or part of the appraised value of
3434 the peace officer's residence homestead if the exemption is adopted
3535 by the governing body of the taxing unit in the manner required by
3636 law for official action by the governing body.
3737 (t) The governing body of a taxing unit may adopt the
3838 exemption provided by Subsection (s) as a specified dollar amount
3939 or as a percentage of the appraised value of the property.
4040 SECTION 4. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended
4141 to read as follows:
4242 (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
4343 the market value of all taxable property less:
4444 (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
4545 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b), [or] (c), or
4646 (s), Tax Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each
4747 school district;
4848 (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any
4949 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
5050 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
5151 district;
5252 (3) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
5353 before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements
5454 authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
5555 (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
5656 of any captured appraised value of property that:
5757 (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or
5858 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
5959 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
6060 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
6161 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
6262 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
6363 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
6464 provided by former Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31,
6565 1999, and within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries
6666 existed on September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to
6767 the property regardless of when made;
6868 (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment
6969 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
7070 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
7171 before September 1, 1999; and
7272 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
7373 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
7474 (5) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
7575 value of property that:
7676 (A) is within a reinvestment zone:
7777 (i) created on or before December 31, 2008,
7878 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
7979 (ii) the project plan for which includes
8080 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
8181 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
8282 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
8383 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
8484 or for affordable housing;
8585 (B) generates school district taxes that are paid
8686 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
8787 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
8888 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
8989 (6) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
9090 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
9191 (7) the difference between the comptroller's estimate
9292 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
9393 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
9494 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
9595 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
9696 (8) the portion of the appraised value of residence
9797 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
9898 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
9999 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
100100 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
101101 required by law;
102102 (9) a portion of the market value of property not
103103 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of
104104 action required by statute or the constitution of this state, other
105105 than Section 11.311, Tax Code, that, if the tax rate adopted by the
106106 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
107107 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
108108 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
109109 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
110110 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
111111 portion to be deducted;
112112 (10) the market value of all tangible personal
113113 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
114114 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
115115 (11) the appraised value of property the collection of
116116 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
117117 Code;
118118 (12) the portion of the appraised value of property
119119 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
120120 Section 33.065, Tax Code;
121121 (13) the amount by which the market value of a
122122 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
123123 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
124124 that section; and
125125 (14) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
126126 under Section 11.35, Tax Code.
127127 SECTION 5. This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
128128 for a tax year that begins on or after the effective date of this
129129 Act.
130130 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only
131131 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
132132 Regular Session, 2025, authorizing a local option exemption from ad
133133 valorem taxation of all or part of the appraised value of the
134134 residence homesteads of certain peace officers is approved by the
135135 voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act
136136 has no effect.