Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1486 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#478 | Journal Page: 1764 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#478 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#434 | Journal Page: 1714 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#434 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1714 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 12/20/2024 | Filed |