Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 524 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#745 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#650 | Journal Page: 1967 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1967 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#650 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1967 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1533 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 12/20/2024 | Filed |