Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1745 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/03/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 10 2025 2:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendment(s)