Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#466
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote RV#466
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#417
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote RV#417
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote RV#416
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Amended
|
2-Toth
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Amended 2-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Toth
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Toth
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Postponed
|
4/23/25 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Postponed 4/23/25 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1597
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Postponed 4/22/25 1:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 467
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|