Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB180 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/06/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/13/2025 10:30 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House