Senate | 05/08/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1887 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Record vote | RV#1788 | |
House | 05/08/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3200 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Record vote | RV#1676 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3192 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3192 | |
House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1837 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 01/09/2025 | Filed |