Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1805 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/09/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R5661 JON-D
 By: Oliverson H.B. No. 1805




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Religious Freedom Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 4, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 452 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 452. RELIGIOUS FREEDOM COMMISSION
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 452.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "commission"
 means the Religious Freedom Commission.
 Sec. 452.002.  ESTABLISHMENT. (a) The commission is
 established within the office of the governor.
 (b)  Chapter 2110 does not apply to the commission.
 SUBCHAPTER B. COMPOSITION AND MEETINGS
 Sec. 452.051.  COMPOSITION OF COMMISSION. (a) The governor
 shall appoint seven members to the commission.
 (b)  A member of the commission must be a resident of this
 state.
 (c)  The commission must include members who:
 (1)  have demonstrated a significant interest in and
 are knowledgeable about issues related to religious liberty; or
 (2)  have served prominently as leaders of or
 spokespersons for organizations that serve members of religious
 communities, including the Christian, Hindu, Jewish, and Muslim
 communities.
 Sec. 452.052.  TERMS. (a) Commission members serve
 staggered six-year terms with the terms of approximately one-third
 of the members expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year.
 (b)  Commission members are eligible for reappointment to
 another term or part of a term.
 (c)  The governor shall fill any vacancy in a position on the
 commission for the unexpired portion of the term.
 Sec. 452.053.  PRESIDING OFFICER. The governor shall
 designate a member of the commission as presiding officer of the
 commission to serve in that capacity at the pleasure of the
 governor.
 Sec. 452.054.  COMPENSATION; EXPENSES. A member of the
 commission is not entitled to compensation but is entitled to
 reimbursement for the travel expenses incurred by the member while
 transacting commission business, as provided by the General
 Appropriations Act.
 Sec. 452.055.  MEETINGS; QUORUM. (a) The commission shall
 meet at least quarterly at the times and places in this state the
 commission designates.
 (b)  Four members of the commission constitute a quorum for
 transacting commission business.
 SUBCHAPTER C. DUTIES
 Sec. 452.101.  DUTIES OF COMMISSION. The commission shall:
 (1)  advance the right to freedom of religion within
 this state, denounce violations of that right, and recommend
 appropriate responses by the legislature to the violations;
 (2)  identify system-level challenges and solutions
 relating to religious liberty for all faith communities;
 (3)  serve as a principal advisor to the governor
 regarding matters affecting religious freedom within this state;
 (4)  make recommendations regarding:
 (A)  local and state policies that violate freedom
 of religion or that fail to ensure the individual's right to
 religious belief and practice;
 (B)  policies that advance the right to freedom of
 religion in this state; and
 (C)  strategies to address and prevent
 faith-related bias incidents; and
 (5)  engage in education, advocacy, and outreach
 efforts to promote understanding and awareness of the importance of
 religious liberty.
 SUBCHAPTER D. SUPPORT AND FUNDING
 Sec. 452.151.  SUPPORT. The office of the governor shall
 provide administrative support, including staff, to the
 commission.
 Sec. 452.152.  FUNDING. (a) The commission may accept gifts
 and grants from a public or private source on behalf of the
 commission for the commission to use in performing the duties
 assigned to the commission under this chapter.
 (b)  All legislative appropriations to support the functions
 and activities of the commission shall be made as part of the office
 of the governor's legislative appropriations request process and
 disbursed to the commission.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor shall appoint members to the Religious
 Freedom Commission as provided by Chapter 452, Government Code, as
 added by this Act. To implement the staggering of terms of members
 of the commission provided by Section 452.052, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, in making the first appointments to the
 commission, the governor shall provide for two of the members to
 serve terms expiring February 1, 2027, two of the members to serve
 terms expiring February 1, 2029, and three of the members to serve
 terms expiring February 1, 2031. Subsequent appointments shall be
 for six-year terms, as provided by Section 452.052, Government
 Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.