LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1816
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1816
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1816
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/25/2025
8:00 am
Intergovernmental Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.026
HB505
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB1080
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB1585
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB1593
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:44PM
HB1816
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1950
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB1985
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2421
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB2615
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2713
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)