Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2097 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#768 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#768 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#689 | Journal Page: 2006 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#689 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 553 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 553 | |
House | 01/13/2025 | Filed |