LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1832
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1832
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1832
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025
10:30 am
Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB1583
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB1775
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB1832
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/11/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1836
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1837
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1866
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
HB1983
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
HB2029
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
HB2217
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB2318
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2363
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB2486
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars