Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1269 | Journal Page: 2655 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2655 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2655 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 2520 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1160 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2520 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 558 | |
House | 01/16/2025 | Filed |