LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1918
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1918
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1918
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025
8:00 am
Natural Resources Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.036
HB29
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB685
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB1633
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB1689
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB1690
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
HB1918
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2010
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2500
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2608
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2626
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call