Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1510 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#585 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1900 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1900 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1815 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#545 | Journal Page: 1814 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#545 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 561 | |
House | 01/16/2025 | Filed |