Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1032 | Journal Page: 2350 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#889 | Journal Page: 2216 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2216 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#889 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 1-Landgraf | Journal Page: 2214 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2214 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 1-Landgraf | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1134 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 562 | |
House | 01/17/2025 | Filed |