Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:27PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee