Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1959 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services