Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1663 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1010 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#863 | Journal Page: 2194 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#863 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended | 1-J. Garcia | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2193 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Amended 1-J. Garcia | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 01/22/2025 | Filed |