Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice