Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1983 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025 10:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/11/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars