Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB202 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R6072 DRS-D
 By: Metcalf H.B. No. 202




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to making permanent the limitation on increases in the
 appraised value of certain real property for ad valorem tax
 purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.19(o), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (o)  A notice required under Subsection (a) or (g) to be
 delivered to the owner of real property other than a single-family
 residence that qualifies for an exemption under Section 11.13 must
 include the following statement: "Under Section 23.231, Tax Code,
 [for the 2024, 2025, and 2026 tax years,] the appraised value of
 real property other than a residence homestead for ad valorem tax
 purposes may not be increased by more than 20 percent each year,
 with certain exceptions." [The circuit breaker limitation provided
 under Section 23.231, Tax Code, expires December 31, 2026. Unless
 this expiration date is extended by the Texas Legislature,
 beginning in the 2027 tax year, the circuit breaker limitation
 provided under Section 23.231, Tax Code, will no longer be in effect
 and may result in an increase in ad valorem taxes imposed on real
 property previously subject to the limitation." This subsection
 expires December 31, 2027.]
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions are repealed:
 (1)  Section 23.231(k), Tax Code;
 (2)  Section 4.02, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section
 1.12(d), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027;
 (3)  Section 4.05, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Sections
 25.19(b) and (g), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027;
 (4)  Section 4.08, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section
 41.41(a), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027;
 (5)  Section 4.10, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Section
 42.26(d), Tax Code, as effective January 1, 2027; and
 (6)  Section 4.12, Chapter 1 (S.B. 2), Acts of the 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, 2023, which amended Sections
 403.302(d) and (i), Government Code, as effective January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies only to the appraisal of
 property for ad valorem tax purposes for a tax year that begins on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, to authorize the legislature to make
 permanent the limit on the maximum appraised value of real property
 other than a residence homestead for ad valorem tax purposes is
 approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.