LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2026
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2026
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2026
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/24/2025
11:00 am
S/C on Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.026
HCR92
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
HB114
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
HB561
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1171
Introduced
Last Action: 03/24/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB1894
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
HB2026
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
HB2143
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB2337
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2564
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar