Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB207 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/25/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice