LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2070
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2070
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2070
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/01/2025
8:00 am
Human Services
E2.030
HB741
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB1199
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2070
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2402
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB2542
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB2665
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2789
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB3096
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Placed on local & uncontested calendar
HB3396
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB3595
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB3747
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB4116
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4127
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call