House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|