Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1486 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#491 | Journal Page: 1763 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#491 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1763 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1763 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#450 | Journal Page: 1718 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#450 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1433 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 576 | |
House | 01/27/2025 | Filed |