House | 04/22/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 1786 | Journal Page: 1598 |
House | 04/14/2025 | Postponed | 4/22/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1361 |
House | 04/14/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1341 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Postponed 4/22/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 577 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 577 | |
House | 01/27/2025 | Filed |