Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB212 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 89R1135 MM-F
22 By: Cain H.B. No. 212
33
44
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to the establishment of a parental empowerment program
1010 administered by the comptroller of public accounts.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as the Texas Parental
1313 Empowerment Act of 2025.
1414 SECTION 2. The legislature finds that:
1515 (1) parents should be empowered to direct their
1616 children's education;
1717 (2) there is not one best educational option for all
1818 children in this state;
1919 (3) children belong to their parents, not to the
2020 government;
2121 (4) the best education for children in this state is
2222 one directed by their parents, with all educational options made
2323 available and accessible through a program in which money follows
2424 each child to the educational option that best meets the child's
2525 unique educational needs; and
2626 (5) in Espinoza v. Montana Department of Revenue, 591
2727 U.S. 464 (2020) and Carson v. Makin, 596 U.S. 767 (2022), the United
2828 States Supreme Court held that state prohibitions on the use of
2929 generally available state tuition assistance programs for children
3030 to attend religious schools violate the Free Exercise Clause of the
3131 First Amendment to the United States Constitution.
3232 SECTION 3. The purpose of this Act is to achieve a general
3333 diffusion of knowledge, increase efficiency by providing highly
3434 qualified education professionals an opportunity to empower
3535 parents to make the best decision regarding the education of the
3636 parent's child, enshrine the parent as the primary decision maker
3737 in all matters involving the parent's child, and fully fund schools
3838 in this state while giving parents a choice about which type of
3939 school is the right choice for the parent's child.
4040 SECTION 4. Section 48.266, Education Code, is amended by
4141 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
4242 (b-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the commissioner
4343 shall adjust enrollment estimates and entitlement for each school
4444 district for each school year based on information provided by the
4545 comptroller under Section 48.551(g). This subsection expires
4646 September 1, 2030.
4747 SECTION 5. Chapter 48, Education Code, is amended by adding
4848 Subchapter J to read as follows:
4949 SUBCHAPTER J. PARENTAL EMPOWERMENT PROGRAM
5050 Sec. 48.551. PARENTAL EMPOWERMENT PROGRAM. (a) In this
5151 subchapter, "program" means the Parental Empowerment Program
5252 established under this section.
5353 (b) A parent or legal guardian of an eligible student who
5454 agrees to accept reimbursement in an amount that is less than the
5555 state average maintenance and operations expenditures per student
5656 may receive reimbursement from the state for the tuition paid for
5757 the enrollment of the eligible student at a private school in an
5858 amount that is the lesser of:
5959 (1) the tuition paid; or
6060 (2) 80 percent of the state average maintenance and
6161 operations expenditures per student.
6262 (c) A student is eligible to participate in the program if
6363 the student is a school-age child who resides in this state.
6464 (d) Money from the available school fund and federal funds
6565 may not be used for reimbursement under this section.
6666 (e) A private school voluntarily selected by a parent for
6767 the parent's child to attend, with or without governmental
6868 assistance, may not be required to comply with any state law or rule
6969 governing the school's educational program that was not in effect
7070 on January 1, 2025.
7171 (f) The comptroller shall administer the program and
7272 provide reimbursement to a parent or legal guardian of an eligible
7373 student, or the parent's or guardian's assignees, as authorized by
7474 this section.
7575 (g) Not later than October 1 of each year, the comptroller
7676 shall notify the commissioner and the Legislative Budget Board of
7777 the number of eligible students likely to participate in the
7878 program, disaggregated by the school district or open-enrollment
7979 charter school the eligible students would otherwise attend. Not
8080 later than March 1 of each year, the comptroller shall provide final
8181 information to the commissioner and the Legislative Budget Board
8282 regarding the number of students participating in the program,
8383 disaggregated in the same manner as the initial information.
8484 (h) Each school year, the agency shall, subject to the
8585 approval of the governor and the Legislative Budget Board,
8686 distribute to each school district and open-enrollment charter
8787 school on a per student basis a total amount of funding equal to the
8888 amount of any cost savings to the Foundation School Program that
8989 resulted from the operation of the program during the preceding
9090 school year.
9191 Sec. 48.552. ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS. (a) The comptroller may
9292 deduct a percentage of each reimbursement made under this
9393 subchapter to cover the comptroller's administrative costs in
9494 implementing and administering the program. The percentage
9595 deducted from each reimbursement may not exceed the lesser of:
9696 (1) the pro rata cost of the program in the applicable
9797 year; or
9898 (2) two percent of the amount of the reimbursement.
9999 (b) This section expires September 1, 2035.
100100 SECTION 6. (a) As soon as practicable, but not later than
101101 October 15, 2025, the comptroller of public accounts, in
102102 coordination with the commissioner of education, shall adopt rules
103103 to implement the Parental Empowerment Program under Subchapter J,
104104 Chapter 48, Education Code, as added by this Act, including rules to
105105 prevent fraud in financial transactions under the program and to
106106 determine the net savings resulting from implementation of the
107107 program.
108108 (b) The rules adopted under Subsection (a) of this section
109109 must require reconciliation of payments for all reimbursements
110110 within the same fiscal year or within the first month following the
111111 end of the fiscal year.
112112 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.