House | 05/02/2025 | Postponed | 5/6/25 10:00 AM | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2718 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1244 | Journal Page: 2614 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2614 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1244 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 2-Isaac and Cain | Journal Page: 2613 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 2-Isaac | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2613 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Capriglione | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 580 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 580 | |
House | 01/28/2025 | Filed |