Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1447 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | RV#220 | Journal Page: 1447 |
House | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1447 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1447 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | RV#201 | Journal Page: 1423 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1423 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote RV#201 | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Amended | 1-Toth | Journal Page: 1422 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote RV#200 | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Amended 1-Toth | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1422 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 880 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 333 | |
House | 02/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 333 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |