LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2192
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2192
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2192
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/31/2025
10:00 am
S/C on County & Regional Government Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB1845
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2192
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2438
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2529
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2607
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:27PM
HB2658
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB3348
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3505
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3305
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar