House | 04/17/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1531 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 569 | Journal Page: 1530 |
House | 04/16/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1348 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Vote reconsidered in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to s/c on Academic & Career-Oriented Education by chair | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed |