House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1314 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2696 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Amended | 1-Metcalf | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2696 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1210 | Journal Page: 2571 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1210 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Barry | Journal Page: 2571 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2571 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Barry | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 586 | |
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed |