Senate | 05/07/2025 | Referred to Jurisprudence | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1458 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2840 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 588 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 588 | |
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed |