Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2042 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1893 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#579 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1892 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1892 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#536 | Journal Page: 1816 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1808 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#536 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#535 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amended | 4-Cain | Journal Page: 1806 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amended 4-Cain | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1806 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | 3-Schatzline and Toth | Journal Page: 1814 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 3-Schatzline | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 2-Money | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1813 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 1-Olcott | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 589 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 589 | |
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed |