LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB2283
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2283
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2283
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/31/2025
8:00 am
Public Health
E2.030
HB3000
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
HB2622
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB2283
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB541
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 4:17PM
HB1776
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1803
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
HB1669
Introduced
Last Action: 03/31/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2588
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB220
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB3415
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB50
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB1314
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB107
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services