House | 05/05/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1044 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | 5/5/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2563 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed 5/5/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Dis Prev & Women's & Children's Health by Speaker | Journal Page: 593 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 593 | |
House | 01/30/2025 | Filed |