Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#964
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Amended
|
2-Leach
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Postponed
|
4/30/25 11:15 AM
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#810
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment tabled
|
7-Flores
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment tabled 7-Flores
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
3-Leach
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended 1-Harris
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Harris
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Harris
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Postponed
|
4/29/25 10:00 AM
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Postponed 4/29/25 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|