Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2025
Fiscal Note January 31, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 25, 2025
Analysis April 25, 2025
Bill April 25, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 8, 2025