House | 04/29/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2130 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1271 | Journal Page: 2128 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed | 4/29/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1803 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1792 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed 4/29/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed |