Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#997 | Journal Page: 2322 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2322 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2322 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#850 | Journal Page: 2183 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2179 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2178 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed |