House | 05/02/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2745 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 2349 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed | 5/2/25 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2184 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2184 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1539 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 597 | |
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed |