Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2376 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/03/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    89R10005 KRM-F
 By: Campos H.B. No. 2376




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for facilities that provide care and
 services to persons with Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 242.040, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.040.  CERTIFICATION OF NURSING FACILITIES
 [INSTITUTIONS] THAT PROVIDE CARE AND TREATMENT FOR PERSONS WITH
 ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE AND RELATED DISORDERS.
 SECTION 2.  Section 242.040, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (e), and (f) and
 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), and (b-3) to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission [department] shall establish a system
 for certifying nursing facilities [institutions] that meet
 standards adopted by the executive commissioner concerning the
 specialized care and treatment of persons with Alzheimer's disease
 and related disorders.
 (b)  A nursing facility may [An institution is] not [required
 to be certified under this section in order to] provide care and
 treatment for [of] persons with Alzheimer's disease and related
 disorders unless the facility holds a certification issued under
 this section.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b) and subject to
 Subsection (b-2), a nursing facility is not required to hold a
 certification issued under this section to provide care and
 treatment for persons with Alzheimer's disease and related
 disorders before January 1, 2030.
 (b-2)  A nursing facility initially licensed under this
 chapter on or after January 1, 2027, must hold a certification
 issued under this section to provide care and treatment for persons
 with Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
 (b-3)  Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) and this subsection
 expire September 1, 2032.
 (c)  The executive commissioner by rule shall [may] adopt
 standards for the specialized care and treatment of persons with
 Alzheimer's disease and related disorders and provide procedures
 for nursing facilities [institutions] applying for certification
 under this section. The rules must provide for a three-year
 certification period.
 (e)  A nursing facility [An institution] may not advertise or
 otherwise communicate that the facility [institution] is certified
 by the commission [department] to provide specialized care or
 treatment for persons with Alzheimer's disease or related disorders
 unless the facility [institution] is certified under this section.
 (f)  The executive commissioner by rule shall adopt a system
 under which an appropriate number of certifications issued by the
 commission [department] expire on staggered dates occurring in each
 three-year period. If the expiration date of a certification
 changes as a result of this subsection, the commission [department]
 shall prorate the certification fee relating to that certification
 as appropriate.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 247.029, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.029.  CLASSIFICATION OF FACILITIES THAT PROVIDE
 PERSONAL CARE SERVICES TO [FOR] PERSONS WITH ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE OR
 RELATED DISORDERS.
 SECTION 4.  Section 247.029, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1),
 (a-2), and (a-3) to read as follows:
 (a)  The executive commissioner by rule shall establish a
 classification and license for a facility that [advertises,
 markets, or otherwise promotes that the facility] provides personal
 care services to residents who have Alzheimer's disease or related
 disorders. A facility may not [is not required to be classified
 under this section to] provide personal care services [care or
 treatment] to residents who have Alzheimer's disease or related
 disorders unless the facility is classified under this section.
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) and subject to
 Subsection (a-2), a facility is not required to be classified under
 this section to provide personal care services to persons with
 Alzheimer's disease or related disorders before January 1, 2030.
 (a-2)  A facility initially licensed under this chapter on or
 after January 1, 2027, must be classified under this section to
 provide personal care services to persons with Alzheimer's disease
 or related disorders.
 (a-3)  Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) and this subsection
 expire September 1, 2032.
 SECTION 5.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the rules necessary to implement
 the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.