Senate | 05/07/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1504 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Postponed | 5/6/25 1:00 PM | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Hopper | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Amended | 1-Romero | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Amended | 1-Orr | Journal Page: 2801 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) | Journal Page: 2801 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2801 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Postponed | 5/5/25 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 2774 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Postponed | 5/5/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2387 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2387 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Filed |