Senate | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1511 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#552 | Journal Page: 1868 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1868 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote RV#552 | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1868 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn from calendar (contested) | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 03/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 609 | |
House | 02/04/2025 | Filed |